Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | AMENDED 6959A | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.922 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |