Senate | 10/13/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.527 | ||
Senate | 10/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.802 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a7688 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1820 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 6993A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |