Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.666 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a124a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1655 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |