Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMENDED 7054B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1093 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7054A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |