Senate | 08/23/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.342 | ||
Senate | 08/11/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.552 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | substituted for a7381 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1410 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |