Senate | 12/08/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.52 | ||
Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.712 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.757 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a4911 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1705 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |