Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9076A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7093A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to libraries and education technology | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.697 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1217 |