Senate | 12/12/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.26 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.553 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a6425a | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1254 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7114A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |