Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5073A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.943 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7125A | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |