Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.944 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7158A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |