Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5984B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1351 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7177B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7177A | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |