Senate | 06/30/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.182 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.409 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted for a7352 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1193 |