Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7563B | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1573 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7224B | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7224A |