Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1485 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7233B | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7233A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |