Senate | 12/08/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.714 | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.782 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a7613 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1593 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7242A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |