Senate | 11/17/2023 | VETOED MEMO.82 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.225 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted for a4487 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1778 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |