Senate | 07/19/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.206 | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.843 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a7633a | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1709 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7285A | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |