Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7334B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1266 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7334A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |