Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | AMENDED 7342A | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.307 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |