Senate | 05/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7353A | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.826 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1418 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |