Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.601 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.777 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted for a7422 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1432 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |