Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.602 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.664 | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | substituted for a7542 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1548 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |