Senate | 11/17/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.669 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.846 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a7677 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1712 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7387B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7387A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |