Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMENDED (T) 7411B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1119 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1715 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7411A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |