Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1487 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7426A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |