Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.578 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.519 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a10529 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1703 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7462B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7462A | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1553 |