Senate | 12/13/2024 | VETOED MEMO.101 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a7572a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1840 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7498A | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |