Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.96 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.673 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.569 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a7748b | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7515A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.88 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1606 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |