Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.471 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.742 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a7674 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to cities | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1662 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |