Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.780 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1611 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |