Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.579 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.222 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted for a10350 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1096 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1612 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |