Senate | 10/25/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.604 | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.845 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a7673a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | referred to cities | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1614 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |