Senate | 09/29/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.520 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.851 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a5562 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1785 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |