Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.97 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.674 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.459 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a9430b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to science and technology | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7543B | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7543A | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |