Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.149 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.850 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a7763 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1826 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7549A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |