Senate | 11/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.680 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.859 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a7759a | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | message of necessity - 3 day message | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1858 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7566B | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 7566A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |