Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7862A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.882 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7577A | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |