Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1763 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7609B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 05/31/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7609A | ||
Senate | 07/21/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |