Senate | 08/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.271 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a8042 | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1465 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES | ||
Senate | 09/25/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |