Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.581 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.532 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8138b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7676B | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7676A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.945 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |