Senate | 08/09/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.221 | ||
Senate | 08/09/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.533 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8147a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1361 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7679A | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |