Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.385 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.615 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8127a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.806 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7680A | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |