Senate | 02/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.86 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.268 | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | substituted for a8090 | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.89 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |