Senate | 06/20/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.121 | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.535 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8149a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1844 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7695B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7695A | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |