Senate | 05/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7697B | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7697A | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |