Assembly | 01/22/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.102 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7700A | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |