Senate | 08/30/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.298 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.494 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a8186a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1489 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7707A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |