Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1010 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7723B | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7723A | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Senate | 10/20/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |