Senate | 05/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7729B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 7729A | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 10/27/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |