Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9888C | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7731A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1019 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |